This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 15:16:34 (UTC).

FIVE STAR BANK v. SHERIDAN M. MEAKER

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 FIVE STAR BANK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SHERIDAN M MEAKER. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIVE STAR BANK

Defendant

Sheridan M. Meaker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCANDREW, JOHN KEVIN

Attorney at WOODS OVIATT GILMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT Aff additional mailing

AFFIDAVIT Aff additional mailing; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Aff of investigator and military pull

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Aff of investigator and military pull; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SCRA Atty Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SCRA Atty Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exh B to Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exh B to Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exh A to Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exh A to Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) Affirmation of Default and in Support of Fees

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) Affirmation of Default and in Support of Fees; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Aff additional mailing; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Aff of investigator and military pull; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SCRA Atty Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exh B to Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exh A to Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) Affirmation of Default and in Support of Fees; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less