Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 14:32:43 (UTC).

FIVE STAR BANK v. DAVID G. CLARK

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 FIVE STAR BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID G CLARK. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIVE STAR BANK

Defendant

David G. Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCANDREW, JOHN KEVIN

Attorney at WOODS OVIATT GILMAN LLP

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #01)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Aff of investigator and military pull

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Aff of investigator and military pull; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) SCRA Atty Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) SCRA Atty Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Fee Aff

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Fee Aff; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Fee Aff

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Fee Aff; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Exh H to Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Exh H to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #01) Exh G to Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #01) Exh G to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcandrew, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DAVID G. CLARK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DAVID G. CLARK; Filed By: Mcandrew, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Aff of investigator and military pull; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) SCRA Atty Affirmation; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Fee Aff; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Fee Aff; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Exh H to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #01) Exh G to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #01) Exh F to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) Exh C to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Exh B to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Exh A to Affidavit; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcandrew, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DAVID G. CLARK; Filed By: Mcandrew, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcandrew, J.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less