Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:19:01 (UTC).

First Source Federal Credit Union - v. - Tai T Tran et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 First Source Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tai T Tran. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick F Macrae. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1361

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Patrick F Macrae

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Source Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Tai T Tran

Hieu T Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RADEL, PATRICK GERARD

Attorney at GETNICK LIVINGSTON ATKINSON & PRIORE, LLP

EGHIGIAN, DAVID ANDREW

Attorney at GETNICK LIVINGSTON ATKINSON & PRIORE, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01)

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) Proposed Order Awarding Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) Proposed Order Awarding Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Department of Defense Manpower Data Center Searches regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Department of Defense Manpower Data Center Searches regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and ... show more; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service of Barbara A. Clark regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. N ... show more

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service of Barbara A. Clark regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. N ... show more; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys F ... show more

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys F ... show more; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and At ... show more

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and At ... show more; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Fact of Tanya Keller in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorney ... show more

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Fact of Tanya Keller in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorney ... show more; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Bare Summons on Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. Nguyen

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Bare Summons on Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. Nguyen; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defendan ... show more

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defendan ... show more; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defend ... show more

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defend ... show more; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) Proposed Order Awarding Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Department of Defense Manpower Data Center Searches regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. Nguyen; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service of Barbara A. Clark regarding Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. Nguyen; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys Fees on both defendants; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #01) Exhibit 8 - Notice of Deficiency to Defendants; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons, Verified Complaintm and E-Filing Notice on Defendant Tai T. Tran; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of David A. Eghigian, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Fact of Tanya Keller in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Eghigian, D.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Bare Summons on Defendants Tai T. Tran and Hieu T. Nguyen; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defendant Hieu T. Nguyen; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with Notice of E-Filing on Defendant Tai T. Tran; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less