Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 07:43:04 (UTC).

First Source Federal Credit Union - v. - Ryan D Swancott et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 First Source Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ryan D Swancott. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Erin P Gall. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1149

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Erin P Gall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Source Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Desiree D Swancott a.k.a desiree fuller

Ryan D Swancott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADEL, PATRICK GERARD

Attorney at GETNICK LIVINGSTON ATKINSON & PRIORE, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01)

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' ... show more

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' ... show more; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Brian J. Ehrhard, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Brian J. Ehrhard, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #01) Exhibit 11 - Sale Contract Dated 2/24/16 and ADESA Check No. 251212359

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #01) Exhibit 11 - Sale Contract Dated 2/24/16 and ADESA Check No. 251212359; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #01) Exhibit 10 - Notice of Plan to Sell Property Dated 1/26/16

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #01) Exhibit 10 - Notice of Plan to Sell Property Dated 1/26/16; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Transaction Summary Note II

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Transaction Summary Note II; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #01) Exhibit 8 - Deficiency Notice Dated 3/4/16

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #01) Exhibit 8 - Deficiency Notice Dated 3/4/16; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Plaintiff's Bare Summons on Defendants

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Plaintiff's Bare Summons on Defendants; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Ryan D. Swancott

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Ryan D. Swancott; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Desiree D. Swancott ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Desiree D. Swancott ... show more; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D-Mastercard Payment History

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D-Mastercard Payment History; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B-Mastercard Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B-Mastercard Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees on Defendants; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Brian J. Ehrhard, Esq. re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #01) Exhibit 11 - Sale Contract Dated 2/24/16 and ADESA Check No. 251212359; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #01) Exhibit 10 - Notice of Plan to Sell Property Dated 1/26/16; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #01) Exhibit 9 - Transaction Summary Note II; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #01) Exhibit 8 - Deficiency Notice Dated 3/4/16; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #01) Exhibit 7 - Sale Contract Dated 3/2/16; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Brian J. Ehrhard, Esq., in support of Plantiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Ehrhard, B.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Plaintiff's Bare Summons on Defendants; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Ryan D. Swancott; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Summons with Verified Complaint on Defendant Desiree D. Swancott a/k/a Desiree Fuller; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D-Mastercard Payment History; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B-Mastercard Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A-Closed-End Note, Disclosure, Loan and Security Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less