This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 02:28:29 (UTC).

FIRST SOURCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. CATHERINE MILLSON

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 FIRST SOURCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CATHERINE MILLSON. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David A Murad. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0124

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David A Murad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST SOURCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Catherine Millson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADEL, PATRICK GERARD

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2021; Received: 07/09/2021

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #02) Statement for Judgment (proposed) pursuant to Court's Order of 7/7/21

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #02) Statement for Judgment (proposed) pursuant to Court's Order of 7/7/21; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/09/2021; Received: 07/09/2021

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Default Judgment and Attorneys Fees

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Default Judgment and Attorneys Fees; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Order Awarding Summary Judgment and attorneys' fees (corrected))

ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Order Awarding Summary Judgment and attorneys' fees (corrected)); Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/29/2021; Received: 06/29/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02) Order Granting Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees (proposed)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02) Order Granting Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees (proposed); Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #02) Affidavit of Mailing Amended Notice of Motion for Default Judgment to defendant

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #02) Affidavit of Mailing Amended Notice of Motion for Default Judgment to defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/03/2021; Received: 06/03/2021

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #02) Notice of Motion (Amended) to include motion date and time

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #02) Notice of Motion (Amended) to include motion date and time; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #02) Exhibit 6- Report of non-military status of defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #02) Exhibit 6- Report of non-military status of defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 05/17/2021; Received: 05/17/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - VISA Credit Card Statements

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - VISA Credit Card Statements; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - VISA Credit Card Application/Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - VISA Credit Card Application/Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Account Transaction History

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Account Transaction History; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Note Dated 5/10/17

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Note Dated 5/10/17; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Barbara A. Clark re: Non-Military Status of Defendant

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Barbara A. Clark re: Non-Military Status of Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Fact of Michael Orsomarso in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Fact of Michael Orsomarso in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

AFFIRMATION Affirmaton of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint

AFFIRMATION Affirmaton of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

SUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons

SUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2021; Received: 07/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #02) Statement for Judgment (proposed) pursuant to Court's Order of 7/7/21; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 07/09/2021; Received: 07/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Default Judgment and Attorneys Fees; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Order Awarding Summary Judgment and attorneys' fees (corrected)); Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/29/2021; Received: 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02) Order Granting Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees (proposed); Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #02) Affidavit of Mailing Amended Notice of Motion for Default Judgment to defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 06/03/2021; Received: 06/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #02) Notice of Motion (Amended) to include motion date and time; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #02) Exhibit 6- Report of non-military status of defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 05/17/2021; Received: 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #02) Exhibit 5- Attorney Fee Schedule; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 05/17/2021; Received: 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Schedule Attorneys' Fees; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - VISA Credit Card Statements; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - VISA Credit Card Application/Agreement; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Account Transaction History; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Note Dated 5/10/17; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Barbara A. Clark re: Non-Military Status of Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., re: Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Fact of Michael Orsomarso in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmaton of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 01/15/2021; Received: 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less