Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 01:48:37 (UTC).

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o 3 East 84th Street Corporation et al v. LICO CONTRACTING INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o 3 East 84th Street Corporation filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LICO CONTRACTING INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucy Billings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lucy Billings

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o 3 East 84th Street Corporation

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o 10 East 85th Street Corporation

THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT a/s/o Philip Schatten and Cheryl Fishbein

Defendants and Petitioners

LICO CONTRACTING INC.

LF INVESTMENTS LLC,

Robert Reichner

OSTROFF ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC.

GRAHAM PLUMBING COMPANY, INC.

AXIS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

PETER DINATALE & ASSOCIATES INC.

SYLVESTER CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

JOSEPH SGROI & SONS, INC.

ROSE DEMOLITION & CARTING, INC.

INTELLI-TEC SECURITY SERVICES, INC.

Respondents

INTELLI-TEC SECURITY SERVICES INC.

OSTROFF ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC.

PETER DINATALE & ASSOCIATES INC.

SYLVESTER CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

JOSEPH SGROI & SONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPS, ROBERT C

Attorney at SHEPS LAW GROUP, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL GUARARRA

Defendant Attorneys

GUARARRA, MICHAEL

Attorney at GUARARRA LAW FIRM

BUNDSCHUH, STEVEN MICHAEL

Attorney at HANNUM FERETIC, PRENDERGAST & MERLINO, LLC

SULLIVAN, JOHN THOMAS

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULMNEY & CARPENTER

LASALA, ALEXANDER AUGUSTUS

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter

GOLDSTEIN, STEVEN F

Attorney at STEVEN F GOLDSTEIN LLP

FUSCO, CHRISTOPHER GERALD

Attorney at CALLAHAN & FUSCO, LLC

KIRBY, GERALD FRANCIS

Attorney at FELDMAN, RUDY, KIRBY & FARQUHARSON, P.C.

WALLITT, CAROLINE P

Attorney at Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum, PC

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN THOMAS SULLIVAN ALEXANDER AUGUSTUS LASALA

CHRISTOPHER GERALD FUSCO

GERALD FRANCIS KIRBY

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross Claim and Demand for Bill of Particulars on Answer to Amended Complaint from Sylvester Construction Services Inc.

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross Claim and Demand for Bill of Particulars on Answer to Amended Complaint from Sylvester Construction Services Inc.; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Goldstein, S.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

ANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Sylvester Construction Services, Inc.

ANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Sylvester Construction Services, Inc.; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation of Christopher G. Fusco, Esq. in Support of PHV Application

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation of Christopher G. Fusco, Esq. in Support of PHV Application; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Daniel P. Costello, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Daniel P. Costello, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Daniel P. Costello, Esq. in Support of PHV Application

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Daniel P. Costello, Esq. in Support of PHV Application; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Guararra, M.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Lico Answer; Index No. CV-033608-19/NY (Action 5)

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Lico Answer; Index No. CV-033608-19/NY (Action 5); Filed By: Guararra, M.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Deman ... show more

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Deman ... show more; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ANSWER Answer to Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Sheps, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross Claim and Demand for Bill of Particulars on Answer to Amended Complaint from Sylvester Construction Services Inc.; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Goldstein, S.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Sylvester Construction Services, Inc.; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation of Christopher G. Fusco, Esq. in Support of PHV Application; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Daniel P. Costello, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Daniel P. Costello, Esq. in Support of PHV Application; Filed By: Fusco, C.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Order Granting PHV Admission to Daniel P. Costello, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Guararra, M.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Lico Answer; Index No. CV-033608-19/NY (Action 5); Filed By: Guararra, M.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance - LF Investments, LLC and Robert Reichner; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Sheps, R.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less