This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 18:52:14 (UTC).

Fiona Hetzner-Broger - v. - 827 Jefferson LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Fiona Hetzner-Broger filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 827 Jefferson LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jury Coordinating Part 1. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jury Coordinating Part 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fiona Hetzner-broger

Defendant and Petitioner

827 Jefferson LLC

Respondents

RENOVATIONS ARE US, LLC

JERUSALEM CARTING, INC.

EMMA GROUP MANAGEMENT INC.

CIANO CONCRETE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARWOOD, DONALD AVERILL

Attorney at Harwood Reiff LLC

REIFF, SIMON W.

Attorney at Harwood Reiff LLC

Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN A WEG

Defendant Attorney

WEG, STEVEN A

Attorney at GOLDBERG WEG & MARKUS PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Second Third Party Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Notice

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Ciano Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Third Party Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Photographs; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Stop Work Order Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Stop Work Order Complaint; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 827 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 827 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 823 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 823 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Notice of Default; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Engineer's Report

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Engineer's Report; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Temporary License Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Temporary License Agreement; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #8); Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #8) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #8) Second Third Party Complaint; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #8) Notice; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #8) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #8) Ciano Agreement; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #8) Third Party Complaint; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #8) Answer; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #8) License Agreement; Filed By: Weg, S.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 Photographs; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 Stop Work Order Complaint; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 827 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 823 Jefferson Avenue DOB Complaints; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Notice of Default; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Engineer's Report; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Temporary License Agreement; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Reiff, S.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less