This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:38:15 (UTC).

FERNELLY SARRIA JR - v. - ADAM S CRUZ et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 FERNELLY SARRIA JR filed an Other lawsuit against ADAM S CRUZ. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fernelly Sarria JR

Defendants

Ismael Perez

Adam S Cruz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN, PERRY D

Attorney at PERRY DEAN FREEMAN

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO, ADAM PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of Karen L. Lawrence

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Perez

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Perez; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

ANSWER Cruz

ANSWER Cruz; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/26/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/26/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Cruz

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Cruz; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/26/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Cruz; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Cruz; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Perez; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less