Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:33:08 (UTC).

FERNANDO ARUFE - v. - EMPIRE TRANSIT MIX, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 FERNANDO ARUFE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EMPIRE TRANSIT MIX, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fernando Arufe

Defendants and Petitioners

EMPIRE TRANSIT MIX, INC.

46-02 VERNON BLVD, LLC

Respondents

STRUCTURETECH NEW YORK, INC.

NYD&E GROUP, INC

ASC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

RMSL GROUP, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMAN, JULIO CESAR

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE P. BIONDI, P.C.

BIONDI, LAWRENCE P.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE PERRY BIONDI, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

ABE M. RYCHIK ADAM DEAN KRAMAN

Defendant Attorneys

RYCHIK, ABE M.

Attorney at KATZ & RYCHIK P.C.

PARPAS, GEORGE

Attorney at Wade Clark Mulcahy

KRAMAN, ADAM DEAN

Attorney at Katz & Rychik P.C.

SCHAUER, MARC SAMUEL

Attorney at Wade Clark Mulcahy LLP

Respondent Attorneys

THOMAS G CHOJNACKI

DANIEL AUSTIN SCHILLING (749.287) ROCCO PHILLIP MATRA (749.287) AYDA IREM SUBEROGLU

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) Stip. So-Ordered dated 01/29/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) Stip. So-Ordered dated 01/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) DATED 1/8/20

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) DATED 1/8/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Chojnacki, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's MSJ

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's MSJ; Filed By: Chojnacki, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Sever

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Sever; Filed By: Kraman, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) ORDER ON 2ND MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) ORDER ON 2ND MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) NOTE OF ISSUE

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/16/18

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/16/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/27/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/27/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 01/04/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Parpas, G.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Empire Transit Mix Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Empire Transit Mix Inc.; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 46-02 Vernon Blvd. LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 46-02 Vernon Blvd. LLC; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) Stip. So-Ordered dated 01/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) DATED 1/8/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Chojnacki, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's MSJ; Filed By: Chojnacki, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Sever; Filed By: Kraman, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) ORDER ON 2ND MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #5) FINAL PRE NOTE ORDER; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 08/23/2018; Received: 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/16/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 11/27/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 01/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Parpas, G.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Empire Transit Mix Inc.; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 46-02 Vernon Blvd. LLC; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less