This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:36:44 (UTC).

FERNANDO APARECIDO BITTENCOURT - v. - M.A. CONSTRUCTION AND RENOVATION, INC et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 FERNANDO APARECIDO BITTENCOURT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against M A CONSTRUCTION AND RENOVATION, INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fernando aparecido Bittencourt

Defendants

2 DSA RESIDENTIAL, LLC.

DELANCEY BUILDERS LLC

M.A. CONSTRUCTION AND RENOVATION, INC

T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES, LLC., and

SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC

DELANCEY ASSOCIATES, LLC.

SITE 2 DSA COMMERCIAL LLC

SITE 2 DSA OWNER, LLC

SITE 2 DSA THEATER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NORTON, TIMOTHY WILLIAM

Attorney at GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD, LLP

PAYNE, STEVEN R

Attorney at GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD L.L.P

Defendant Attorney

MAGEE, PATRICK C

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #002)

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/15/2018; Received: 09/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA COMMERCIAL LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA COMMERCIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected* FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected* FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) *Corrected* SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) *Corrected* SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMONS; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DELANCEY ASSOCIATES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DELANCEY ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/15/2018; Received: 09/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DELANCEY BUILDERS LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA COMMERCIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected* FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) *Corrected* SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMONS; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DELANCEY ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SITE 2 DSA RESIDENTIAL LLC; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Norton, T.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less