This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 09/02/2020 at 07:36:55 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. SHELDON DAVIS et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHELDON DAVIS. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Otsego, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD,

EASTERN FINANCIAL CORP.,

Sheldon Davis

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE,

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT,

NORWEST MORTGAGE, INC.,

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU,

JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, PARTIES INTENDED BEING POSSIBLE TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES, AND CORPORATIONS, OTHER ENTITIES OR PERSONS WHO CLAIM, OR MAY CLAIM, A LIEN AGAINST THE PREMISES,

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK,

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - P SHORT FORM ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 7, 2019 (INDEX NO.: 20986/09)

EXHIBIT(S) - P SHORT FORM ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 7, 2019 (INDEX NO.: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - O CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEYS

EXHIBIT(S) - O CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEYS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N ORDER DISMISSING ACTION

EXHIBIT(S) - N ORDER DISMISSING ACTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - M STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - M STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L ORDER DATED AUGUST 27, 2015 (INDEX NO: 20986/09)

EXHIBIT(S) - L ORDER DATED AUGUST 27, 2015 (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K SO-ORDERED STIPULATION SETTLEMENT (INDEX NO: 20986/09)

EXHIBIT(S) - K SO-ORDERED STIPULATION SETTLEMENT (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J ORDER FOR JOINT TRIAL

EXHIBIT(S) - J ORDER FOR JOINT TRIAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I SHELTON HOLT'S SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (INDEX NO: 20986/09)

EXHIBIT(S) - I SHELTON HOLT'S SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H MEMORANDUM DECISION

EXHIBIT(S) - H MEMORANDUM DECISION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION *Corrected*

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P SHORT FORM ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 7, 2019 (INDEX NO.: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEYS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N ORDER DISMISSING ACTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L ORDER DATED AUGUST 27, 2015 (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K SO-ORDERED STIPULATION SETTLEMENT (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J ORDER FOR JOINT TRIAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I SHELTON HOLT'S SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (INDEX NO: 20986/09); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H MEMORANDUM DECISION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G APPLICATION OF ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/19/2020; Received: 08/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2020; Received: 08/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less