This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:00:29 (UTC).

Federal National Mortgage Association - v. - Princess James et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 Federal National Mortgage Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Princess James. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal National Mortgage Association

Defendants

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Princess James

City of New York Parking Violations Bureau

Not Yet Classified

Aaron Tyk Referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TYK, AARON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE for JFS with AOS

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE for JFS with AOS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Invoices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Invoices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ALEXA RAINES AS JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ALEXA RAINES AS JOHN DOE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-MICHAEL BURROUGHS AS JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-MICHAEL BURROUGHS AS JOHN DOE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CITY OF NEW YORK PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CITY OF NEW YORK PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE for JFS with AOS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) Affidavit Under Section 255 of the NY Tax Law Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Invoices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-CYNTHIA RAINES AS JOHN DOE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ALEXA RAINES AS JOHN DOE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-MICHAEL BURROUGHS AS JOHN DOE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CITY OF NEW YORK PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less