This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 00:20:21 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION - v. - MARY J. MORRIS et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARY J MORRIS. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FANNIE MAE

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (FANNIE MAE), A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

Mary J Morris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTNESS

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTNESS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) 3215

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) 3215; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) LIS PENDENS

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-Any AND All Occupants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-Any AND All Occupants; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARY J. MORRIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARY J. MORRIS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) POWER OF ATTORNEY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTNESS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) 3215; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT PERTAINING TO N&M-MARY J. MORRIS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-Any AND All Occupants; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARY J. MORRIS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less