This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 03:15:08 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION - v. - MARCO T. PALACIOS et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARCO T PALACIOS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria S Vazquezdoles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Maria S Vazquezdoles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

Marco T. Palacios

John Doe

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

MUNA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

ILARDO, MARY BEATRICE

Attorney at Mary B. Ilardo

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

SZCZYGIEL, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

Defendant Attorneys

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

SERRANO, ROSELINA

Attorney at Law Offices of Serrano & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Extend time to file Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Extend time to file Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re: Bankruptcy Status

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re: Bankruptcy Status; Filed By: Serrano, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI); Filed By: Serrano, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING ORDER OF REFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING ORDER OF REFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/19/2018; Received: 10/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Extend time to file Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re: Bankruptcy Status; Filed By: Serrano, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI); Filed By: Serrano, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ilardo, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING ORDER OF REFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/19/2018; Received: 10/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES WIGFALL 1303; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less