This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 03/27/2020 at 16:35:52 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION - v. - JENNIFER BROWNE et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JENNIFER BROWNE. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****-791

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FANNIE MAE A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (FANNIE MAE), A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

Thomas C Browne

Jennifer Browne

Thomas Browne A/K/A THOMAS C. BROWNE

Thomas c. Browne A/k/a

John Doe 1-JOHN DOE 12 THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,THE PERSONS OR PARTIES INTENDED BEING THE TENANTS, OCCUPANTS, PERSONS OR CORPS, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN OR LIEN UPON THE PREMISES, DESCRIBED IN T

1-JOHN DOE 12 THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,THE PERSONS OR PARTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

RUSWICK, RICHARD P.

Attorney at Levene Gouldin and Thompson, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER Request to Close Settlement Conference

STIPULATION - OTHER Request to Close Settlement Conference; Filed By: Ruswick, R.; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2106

PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2106; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ JENNIFER BROWNE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ JENNIFER BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILIMG-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILIMG-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JENNIFER BROWNE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JENNIFER BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THOMAS BROWNE A/K/A THOMAS C. BROWNE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THOMAS BROWNE A/K/A THOMAS C. BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Request to Close Settlement Conference; Filed By: Ruswick, R.; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2106; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ruswick, R.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ THOMAS BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ JENNIFER BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILIMG-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JENNIFER BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THOMAS BROWNE A/K/A THOMAS C. BROWNE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less