This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:29:40 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (FANNIE MAE), A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - v. - LENORE C CARNESI et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FANNIE MAE , A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LENORE C CARNESI. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (FANNIE MAE), A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Lenore C Carnesi AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF MILDRED ABRAMS

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FKA BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA NA AS CUSTODIAN OR TRUSTEE

John Doe

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

LIBERTY READY MIX INC.

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, KINGS COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOURTNER, TRACY MCKAY

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

WEINERT, DOUGLAS CHARLES

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC.

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

ROSENFELD, STEVEN

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

HEANEY, ALEXANDRA ROSE

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) *Corrected* NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) *Corrected* NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) *Corrected* SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) *Corrected* SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #2) *Corrected*

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) *Corrected*

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Weinert, D.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/LIBERTY READY MIX, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/LIBERTY READY MIX, INC.; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) *Corrected* NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) *Corrected* SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Weinert, D.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/17/2018; Received: 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/LIBERTY READY MIX, INC.; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less