This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/01/2020 at 15:56:21 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (FANNIE MAE), A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - v. - CHAIM WALTER et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FANNIE MAE , A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHAIM WALTER. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Defendants

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Chana Wosner AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

Selda Turan

John Doe

HUSBANDS, WIDOWERS, HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DESCENDANTS, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, COMMITTEES, LIENORS, AND ASSIGNS, ALL OF WHOM AND WHOSE NAMES, EXCEPT AS STATED, ARE UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,

Gitty Niederman AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

David Walter AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

Chaim Walter AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

SUCH UNKNOWN PERSONS BEING HEREIN GENERALLY DESCRIBED AND INTENDED TO BE INCLUDED IN WIFE, WIDOW, HUSBAND, WIDOWER, HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DESCENDANTS, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, CREDITORS,

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE 89 HARRISON AVENUE CONDOMINIUM

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Mustafa Turan

Martin Walter AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

Esther Schwartz AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

Anshel Walter AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

Shulem Walter AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

TRUSTEES, COMMITTEES, LIENORS, AND ASSIGNEES OF SUCH DECEASED, ANY AND ALL PERSONS DERIVING INTEREST IN OR LIEN UPON, OR TITLE TO SAID REAL PROPERTY BY, THROUGH OR UNDER THEM, OR EITHER OF THEM, AND THEIR RESPECTIVE WIVES, WIDOWS,

NEW JERSEY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

UNKNOWN HEIRS TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER IF LIVING, AND IF HE/SHE BE DEAD, ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF, CLAIMING, OR WHO MAY CLAIM TO HAVE AN INTEREST IN, OR GENERAL OR SPECIFIC LIEN UPON THE REAL PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS ACTION;

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WOHLGELERNTER, SHOLOM

BERG, DAVID

Other Attorneys

GARZA, LEN MATTHEW

STRAUSS, LAURA MARIE

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

POLOWY, AMY E.

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Michalek, Sarah A

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Garza, L.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #1)

ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) proposed amended pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) proposed amended pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SHULEM WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FORENCE WALTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SHULEM WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FORENCE WALTER; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ANSHEL WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ANSHEL WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Garza, L.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Signed Service Transfer Notice; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Affidavit of Service by Mail - Signed STN; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) proposed amended pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affirmation of Due Diligence of John J. Ricciardi Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/31/2018; Received: 12/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - SHULEM WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SHULEM WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FORENCE WALTER; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ANSHEL WALTER AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF FERENCE WALTER; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less