Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 12:03:24 (UTC).

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - v. - EMMANUEL ABAD

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EMMANUEL ABAD. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Arlene P Bluth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Arlene P Bluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

Emmanuel Abad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILSENRATH, STEVEN I

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN I HILSENRATH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

JUDGMENT

--none--

AFFIRMATION

Affirmation of non-military service. (Originally attached to proposed Judgment, which is deleted upon entry of final judgment)

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

DECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S)

Proof of Filing of Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Proof of Filing

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Verified Complaint

AFFIRMATION

Attorney's Affirmation

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of non-military service. (Originally attached to proposed Judgment, which is deleted upon entry of final judgment); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue with Attached Order; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Correspondence; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Proof of Filing of Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proof of Filing; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hilsenrath, S.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less