This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 17:52:04 (UTC).

Evelyn Troutman et al - v. - Claddagh Commission, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 Evelyn Troutman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Claddagh Commission, Inc. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evelyn Troutman as Guardian of the Person and Property of Alexis Y. Bradshaw

Alexis Y Bradshaw

Defendant

Claddagh Commission, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FAHEY, COLLEEN

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

SHALKE, JEFFREY MICHAEL

Attorney at Brown Chiari

Defendant Attorneys

HOLDSWORTH, CHRISTINA G.

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

APPELBAUM, MICHAEL ERIC

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Memorandum Decision

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Response to Notice to Produce

EXHIBIT(S)

Notice to Produce

EXHIBIT(S)

Letters

EXHIBIT(S)

Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

On behalf of Claddagh Commission

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Appelbaum, M.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Shalke, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Memorandum Decision; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Response to Notice to Produce; Filed By: Shalke, J.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Notice to Produce; Filed By: Shalke, J.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Shalke, J.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Letters; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) On behalf of Claddagh Commission; Filed By: Holdsworth, C.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Appelbaum, M.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marble, B.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marble, B.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less