This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:57:50 (UTC).

EVELYN MARTINEZ v. HEARTJAN TAXI, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 EVELYN MARTINEZ filed an Other lawsuit against HEARTJAN TAXI, INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelyn Martinez

Defendants

Arabinda Biswas

HEARTJAN TAXI, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMMELMAN, MICHAEL LAWRENCE

Attorney at MICHAEL KIMMELMAN, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Kimmelman, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) AFF. DR. SPRINGER

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) AFF. DR. SPRINGER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AFF. DR. BUCKNER

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AFF. DR. BUCKNER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) NOTE OF ISSUE

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) PL'S EBT TRANSCRIPT

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) PL'S EBT TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) ANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) BILL OF PARTICULARS

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Kimmelman, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) AFF. DR. SPRINGER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AFF. DR. BUCKNER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) PL'S EBT TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) ANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kimmelman, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less