This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:16:37 (UTC).

EVELYN MARTINEZ et al v. WHITE PLAINS NURSING HOME, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 EVELYN MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WHITE PLAINS NURSING HOME, INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Capella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Capella

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evelyn Martinez , by her Attorney-In-Fact

Dennise Laboy

Defendant

WHITE PLAINS NURSING HOME, INC. d/b/a BRONX PARK REHABILITATION AND NURSING CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN, ANDREW MICHAEL

Attorney at FRIEDMAN SANCHEZ, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN, SANDRA LYNN

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest and Ryan LLP

WONG, MARISSA ARIEL

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/4/2019.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/4/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/8/2019.

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 06/02/2019; Received: 06/02/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 06/02/2019; Received: 06/02/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands and Other Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands and Other Demands; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Def's Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Def's Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ANSWER Def's Verified Answer To Verified Complaint

ANSWER Def's Verified Answer To Verified Complaint; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/4/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 06/02/2019; Received: 06/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 06/02/2019; Received: 06/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands and Other Demands; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Def's Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Def's Verified Answer To Verified Complaint; Filed By: Brown, S.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less