This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 21:39:20 (UTC).

EUGENIA MAKAREWICZ - v. - MICHAEL TRUOCCHIO DDS

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 EUGENIA MAKAREWICZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MICHAEL TRUOCCHIO DDS. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugenia Makarewicz

Defendant

Michael Truocchio DDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REILLY, THOMAS P.

Attorney at CHIANESE & REILLY LAW, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

BENVENUTO, THOMAS J

Attorney at Law Offices of Benvenuto & Slattery

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Response to Expert Witness Demand CPLR 3101d

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)

Jury Demand

AFFIRMATION

Affirmation in Compliance

NOTE OF ISSUE

--none--

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

Corrected Supp BP

BILL OF PARTICULARS

Supplemental Bill of Particulars

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

BILL OF PARTICULARS

Verified Bill of particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

Demand for bill of particulars and Plaintiff's discovery demands

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

response to combined demands

NOTICE TO ADMIT

--none--

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

Demand for bill of particulars and Plaintiff's discovery demands

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

response to combined demands

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

Notice of Dental

ANSWER

Answer for Dr. Truocchio

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Expert Witness Demand CPLR 3101d; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand; Filed By: Benvenuto, T.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Compliance; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Corrected Supp BP; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of particulars; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Notice to Admit; Filed By: Benvenuto, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for bill of particulars and Plaintiff's discovery demands; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND response to combined demands; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for bill of particulars and Plaintiff's discovery demands; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND response to combined demands; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Dental; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer for Dr. Truocchio; Filed By: Benvenuto, T.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Reilly, T.; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less