Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 12:05:22 (UTC).

EUGENE MCCRORY - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 EUGENE MCCRORY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn E. Freed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn E. Freed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Mccrory

Defendants

JUDLAU CONTRACTING, INC.

METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FANNING, DOUGLAS J.

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas J. Fanning, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

STEINBERG, DANA LAUREN

Attorney at FABIANI COHEN & HALL, LLP

GLAZER, SCOTT LANE

Attorney at FABIANI COHEN & HALL, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2020; Received: 04/30/2020

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

Notice to ALL PARTIES re: temporary procedures for Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Consent to Change Attorney (Metropolitan Transportation Authority and New York City Transit Authority)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Metropolitan Transportation Authority and New York City Transit Authority)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED DEMANDS

BILL OF PARTICULARS

VBP & RESPONSES TO COMBINED DEMANDS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

JUDLAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NYCTA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MTA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

City of NY

ANSWER

(Verified)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2020; Received: 04/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Notice to ALL PARTIES re: temporary procedures for Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP; Filed By: Steinberg, D.; Filed: 03/25/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Glazer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney (Metropolitan Transportation Authority and New York City Transit Authority); Filed By: Glazer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Metropolitan Transportation Authority and New York City Transit Authority); Filed By: Glazer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Glazer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney (The City of New York); Filed By: Glazer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 11/04/2017; Received: 11/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 11/04/2017; Received: 11/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 11/04/2017; Received: 11/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS VBP & RESPONSES TO COMBINED DEMANDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 11/04/2017; Received: 11/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JUDLAU; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYCTA; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MTA; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE City of NY; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (Verified); Filed By: Knauer, E.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less