This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 08/15/2022 at 07:27:12 (UTC).

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF AMY STEIER v. ANGEL FELIPE SUAREZ RODRIGUEZ et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF AMY STEIER filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ANGEL FELIPE SUAREZ RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Oliver N Blaise Iii. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2467

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Oliver N Blaise Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF AMY STEIER

Defendants

PRO STAR FREIGHT SYSTEMS, INC.

ARROW FREIGHT SYSTEMS INC.

ANGEL FELIPE SUAREZ RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CANIGLIANANNI, CAMILLE

USLANER, BRITTANY ROSE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Judgment; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/11/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Order; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Order

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Order; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 09/28/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Notice of Motion (Amended)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Notice of Motion (Amended); Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Motion

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Motion; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Amounts Due

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Amounts Due; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Canigliananni, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Canigliananni, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Police Report; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Judgment; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/11/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with Order; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Order; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 09/28/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Notice of Motion (Amended); Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Motion; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Amounts Due; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Canigliananni, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Canigliananni, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Police Report; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Uslaner, B. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less