Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:56:48 (UTC).

ESTELLE HUDSON - v. - SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 ESTELLE HUDSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estelle Hudson

Defendants

BS BIG V, LLC

SHOPRITE OF VAILS GATE

SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC.

BHC BIG V, LLC

BHRA BIG V, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS, ALAN R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALAN R. LEWIS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

MEMORANDUM OF SEPARATION AGREEMENT

MEMORANDUM OF SEPARATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Subpoena

EXHIBIT(S) - A Subpoena; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ANSWER Answer & Demands

ANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite of Vails Gate

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite of Vails Gate; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHC BIG V LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHC BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHRA BIG V LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHRA BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BS BIG V LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BS BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite Supermarkets, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite Supermarkets, Inc.; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF SEPARATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Subpoena; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Amended.Answer; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite of Vails Gate; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHC BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BHRA BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BS BIG V LLC; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Shoprite Supermarkets, Inc.; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less