This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 08:49:51 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DOROTHY SMITH et al v. EMERGI PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 ESTATE OF DOROTHY SMITH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMERGI PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dorothy Smith

Gregory Smith

Defendant

EMERGI PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGELOW, LUKE JEROME

Attorney at VISCARDI BASNER BIGELOW

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - D Deed; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C notice of cancelation

EXHIBIT(S) - C notice of cancelation; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B MEMORANDUM OF CONTRACT

EXHIBIT(S) - B MEMORANDUM OF CONTRACT; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT OF SALE

EXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT OF SALE; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Deed; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C notice of cancelation; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MEMORANDUM OF CONTRACT; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT OF SALE; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Bigelow, L.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less