This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:31:43 (UTC).

Erin Lynch v. New York City Transit Authority et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Erin Lynch filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against New York City Transit Authority. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erin Lynch

Defendants

John Doe

New York City Transit Authority

Metropolitan Transportation Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVORA, GLEN

Attorney at JONATHAN D'AGOSTINO & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

CORREA, HAYDEE

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

NOTICE OF REJECTION NYCTA Notice of Rejection of Service Except By NYSCEF

NOTICE OF REJECTION NYCTA Notice of Rejection of Service Except By NYSCEF; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

DEMAND FOR: NYCTA Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: NYCTA Combined Demands; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS NYCTA Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS NYCTA Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) NYCTA Verified Answer

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) NYCTA Verified Answer; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION NYCTA Notice of Rejection of Service Except By NYSCEF; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: NYCTA Combined Demands; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS NYCTA Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) NYCTA Verified Answer; Filed By: Correa, H.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Devora, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Devora, G.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less