This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 20:50:09 (UTC).

Erana Harris v. Nilpeter USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Erana Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Nilpeter USA, Inc. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4810

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erana Harris

Defendant

Nilpeter USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGAN, JOSEPH A.

Attorney at Faraci Lange, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MASINO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

ROBERTS, NICHOLAS CLYDE

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

CRISTO, LOUIS B.

Attorney at TREVETT CRISTO P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cristo, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Nilpeter

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Nilpeter; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cristo, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Nilpeter; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Regan, J.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less