This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 08:16:28 (UTC).

Empower Federal Credit Union v. Thomas Fabian et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Empower Federal Credit Union filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Thomas Fabian. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1115

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Empower Federal Credit Union s/i/i/t Horizons Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Thomas Fabian

Albert J. Fabian

Richard Fabian

Deborah Young

Timothy Fabian jr.

Louann Taylor

Jodi Taylor

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

The People of the State of New York

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

The United States of America

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, AMANDA C

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS, RANSOM PRATT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/19/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/07/2022; Received: 07/07/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The People of the State of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The People of the State of New York; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The United States of America

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The United States of America; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS Dept. of Taxation and Finance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS Dept. of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Portfolio Recovery Assoc., LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Portfolio Recovery Assoc., LLC; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Capital One Bank

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Capital One Bank; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/19/2022; Received: 07/19/2022

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Capital One Bank; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/19/2022; Received: 07/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Portfolio Recovery Assoc., LLC; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS Dept. of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The United States of America; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The People of the State of New York; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 07/07/2022; Received: 07/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by The Chase Agency LLC; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer & Shaw LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less