This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:54:39 (UTC).

Emily Rodriguez-Roman - v. - Said Wagday et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Emily Rodriguez-Roman filed an Other lawsuit against Said Wagday. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Rodriguez-roman

Defendants

Said Wagday

Tri County Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIENER, JOSEPH B

Attorney at SANDERS, SANDERS, BLOCK, WOYCIK VIENER & GROSSMAN, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

KAPATOS, KONSTANTINOS

Attorney at Cuomo, LLC

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR: COLLATERAL SOURCE INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: COLLATERAL SOURCE INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

DEMAND FOR: WITNESS INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: WITNESS INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Tri County Transportation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Tri County Transportation; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

DEMAND FOR: MEDICARE AND SS

DEMAND FOR: MEDICARE AND SS; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

DEMAND FOR: EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Said Wagday

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Said Wagday; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

DEMAND FOR: AD DAMNUM

DEMAND FOR: AD DAMNUM; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

DEMAND FOR: SOCIAL MEDIA INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: SOCIAL MEDIA INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: SOCIAL MEDIA INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: MEDICARE AND SS; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: AD DAMNUM; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: COLLATERAL SOURCE INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: WITNESS INFORMATION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kapatos, K.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Tri County Transportation; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of summons and complaint on defendant Said Wagday; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Viener, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less