This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 21:46:44 (UTC).

ELSA TEJADA v. 11P LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2019 ELSA TEJADA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 11P LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elsa Tejada

Defendants

L.D. PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

11P LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorney

ABRAMS, DAVID A

Attorney at STRONGIN, ROTHMAN & ABRAMS, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less