This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 20:22:51 (UTC).

ELMIRA SAVINGS BANK v. CHRISTY J. RITTON

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 ELMIRA SAVINGS BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTY J RITTON. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********78CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELMIRA SAVINGS BANK

Defendant

Christy J Ritton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNORS, MARY MCAULEY

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice for service of summons & complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice for service of summons & complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation of Christy J. Ritton Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation of Christy J. Ritton Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice for service of summons & complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation of Christy J. Ritton Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less