This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 03/25/2020 at 13:19:43 (UTC).

ELLEN SANICK - v. - EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 ELLEN SANICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellen Sanick

Defendant

EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorney

RYAN, THOMAS PATRICK

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Demands

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Demands; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion to Preclude

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Demands; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, T.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR EGER HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less