This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 21:58:26 (UTC).

Ella Opsha - v. - 1675 E18th Street LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 Ella Opsha filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1675 E18th Street LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ella Opsha

Defendants

Landau Realty Corp.

1675 E18th Street LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITSKY, DMITRY

Attorney at Levitsky Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

MALONEY, STEPHEN JOSEPH

Attorney at Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Final Pre-Note Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/9/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/9/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/14/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT

DEMAND FOR: Post EBT; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 06/21/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 06/21/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/26/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/22/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/22/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's demand

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's demand; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer and Various Discovery Demands

ANSWER Verified Answer and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/14/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 10/9/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 06/21/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/22/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's demand; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Maloney, S.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levitsky, D.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less