This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 08:44:01 (UTC).

ELIZON MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST I, U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS OWNER TRUSTEE, v. BRAD M. KEESLER A/K/A BRAD KEESLER et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 ELIZON MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST I, U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS OWNER TRUSTEE, filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRAD M KEESLER A/K/A BRAD KEESLER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Eugene D Faughnan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1592

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Eugene D Faughnan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZON MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST I, U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS OWNER TRUSTEE,

Defendants

BRAD M. KEESLER A/K/A BRAD KEESLER

CITIBANK, N.A.

JOHN DOE NUMBERS 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH-SKEETE, DENISE

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK, N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK, N.A.; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RETURNED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RETURNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2022; Received: 09/06/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

AFFIRMATION Affirmation for Settlement Conference

AFFIRMATION Affirmation for Settlement Conference; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loan Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loan Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Necessary Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Necessary Parties; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSH EMMONS SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/22/2022; Received: 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK, N.A.; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RETURNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2022; Received: 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation for Settlement Conference; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Loan Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Necessary Parties; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less