This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 17:56:54 (UTC).

ELIZABETH PIERRE-NOEL v. NADIA JOSEPH et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2019 ELIZABETH PIERRE-NOEL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NADIA JOSEPH. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul Wooten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Paul Wooten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Pierre-noel

Defendants

Margaret Blanc

Nadia Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKENWA, CHUKA STEVE

Attorney at C STEVE OKENWA PC

Defendant Attorney

ALTER, BERNARD MITCHELL

Attorney at ALTER AND BARBARO

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/16/19

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/16/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) DHAITI AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) DHAITI AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) FORGED DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) FORGED DEED; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Process Server's Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Process Server's Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/16/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) DHAITI AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) FORGED DEED; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 06/02/2019; Received: 06/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Process Server's Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Process Server's Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Alter Affirmation in support; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Alter, B.; Filed: 05/25/2019; Received: 05/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Okenwa, C.; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less