This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 06:19:12 (UTC).

ELIOT ENGEL v. WESTCHESTER BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 ELIOT ENGEL filed an Other lawsuit against WESTCHESTER BOARD OF ELECTIONS. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John W Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******020E

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John W Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eliot Engel

Defendants

BOARD OF ELECTIONS IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK

THE NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS

For an Order, pursuant to Sections 16-102, 16-106, 16-112 and 16-113 of the Election Law, directing the preservation of all ballots cast in the Democratic Party Primary Election held on June 23, 2020 for the Democratic Party nomination for the public

Andom Ghebreghiorgis

Christopher Fink

Sammy Ravelo

WESTCHESTER BOARD OF ELECTIONS

Jamaal Bowman

casting or canvassing, or refusal to cast or canvass, any such ballots, as set forth in Election Law Section 16-106 (1); preserving Petitioner's rights under Article 9 of the Election Law and Section 16-113 of the Election Law, and related sections o

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREIG, ARTHUR WILLIAMS

Attorney at ARTHUR W. GREIG, ESQ.

GOLDFEDER, JERRY H.

Attorney at STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MOUNTAIN, FRANCESCA LYNN

Attorney at Westchester County Law Department

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldfeder, J.; Filed: 07/27/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 7/7/2020.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 7/7/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2020; Received: 07/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verification; Filed By: Mountain, F.; Filed: 07/07/2020; Received: 07/07/2020

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #001) Verified Answer

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #001) Verified Answer; Filed By: Mountain, F.; Filed: 07/07/2020; Received: 07/07/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldfeder, J.; Filed: 07/27/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 7/7/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2020; Received: 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verification; Filed By: Mountain, F.; Filed: 07/07/2020; Received: 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #001) Verified Answer; Filed By: Mountain, F.; Filed: 07/07/2020; Received: 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Greig, A.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less