This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:23:47 (UTC).

Elias Slubski v. Hyatt Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Elias Slubski filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hyatt Corporation. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elias Slubski

Defendants

Hyatt Hotels Corporation

Hyatt Corporation

Park Hyatt New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHSBAUM, ANDREW V.

Attorney at ANDREW V. BUCHSBAUM, ESQ., FRIEDMAN & JAMES LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MCCALLION, GAIL K

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Connors, James p

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN AND GOGGIN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/22/20

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/22/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Date: 01/22/2020

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Date: 01/22/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Without Prejudice-HYATT HOTELS CORPORATION (Only)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Without Prejudice-HYATT HOTELS CORPORATION (Only); Filed By: Connors, J.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Connors, J.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic filing upon defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic filing upon defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic Filing upon defendant Hyatt Corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic Filing upon defendant Hyatt Corporation; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/22/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Date: 01/22/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Without Prejudice-HYATT HOTELS CORPORATION (Only); Filed By: Connors, J.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Connors, J.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic filing upon defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint with Notice of Electronic Filing upon defendant Hyatt Corporation; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Buchsbaum, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less