Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:38:01 (UTC).

ELIAS REDROVAN v. 134 EAST 82ND STREET LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 ELIAS REDROVAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 134 EAST 82ND STREET LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Fisher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Pamela Fisher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elias Redrovan

Defendants and Petitioners

134 EAST 82ND STREET LLC

MC GOWAN BUILDERS, INC.

INSPIRON INC

Respondents

Teamwork Construction, INC.

Premier Enterprise Co. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKLOS, JOSEPH

Attorney at Silberstein Awad & Miklos, PC

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL L LEEST

Defendant Attorney

LEEST, MICHAEL L

Attorney at Hannum Feretic Prendergast & Merlino LLC

Respondent Attorney

MICHAEL JAMES HARRISON (0131-022)

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counter-Claims

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counter-Claims; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Answer to Third-Party Complaint and Initial Combined Demands and Notices wi ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Answer to Third-Party Complaint and Initial Combined Demands and Notices wi ... show more; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs

DEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Plaintiff; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand for All Prior Pleadings to Third-Party Plaintiffs

DEMAND FOR: Demand for All Prior Pleadings to Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Third-Party Plaintiffs

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Plaintiff; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand AD Damnum

DEMAND FOR: Demand AD Damnum; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) supplemental summons and amended complaint

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) supplemental summons and amended complaint; Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT aff of service for s&c

AFFIDAVIT aff of service for s&c Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counter-Claims; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Answer to Third-Party Complaint and Initial Combined Demands and Notices with Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands and Notices to Plaintiff; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for All Prior Pleadings to Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Third-Party Plaintiffs; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars to Plaintiff; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Verified Answer to Third Party Complaint with Counterclaims and Cross-Claims; Filed By: Harrison, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice For Examintion Before Trial; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand AD Damnum; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) supplemental summons and amended complaint; Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT aff of service for s&c Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Miklos, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less