Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 07:23:34 (UTC).

EB 2EMINY, LLC - v. - PAULA GRIFFIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JERMAINE JUSTINE GREEN, SHAWNTA MONIE GREEN, SHREE DEON GREEN, ROSEVELT LESHAWN GREEN, et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 EB 2EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PAULA GRIFFIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JERMAINE JUSTINE GREEN, SHAWNTA MONIE GREEN, SHREE DEON GREEN, ROSEVELT LESHAWN GREEN. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1747

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 2EMINY, LLC

Defendants

Sammie Green

COUNTY OF MONROE

KELLY A. REED, AS COMMISSIONER OF THE MONROE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES DIVISION OF SOCIAL SERVICES

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC a/k/a PROPEL TAX

TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 a/k/a TOWER CAPITAL

AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC d/b/a IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE, LLC

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE CCED-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT

DR. JEREMY A. LEICHTNER DDS

PAULA GRIFFIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JERMAINE JUSTINE GREEN, SHAWNTA MONIE GREEN, SHREE DEON GREEN, ROSEVELT LESHAWN GREEN, SAMMIE GREEN, JR. AND MARTIN TYRON GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

TEATOR, MARY EILEEN

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY LAW DEPARTMENT

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Name change

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Name change; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING , LLC D/B/A IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING , LLC D/B/A IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Name change; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Order of reference and affirmation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING , LLC D/B/A IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less