Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 08:56:42 (UTC).

EB 2EMINY, LLC - v. - Luis R. Rodriguez et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 EB 2EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Luis R Rodriguez. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1791

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 2EMINY, LLC

Defendants

Daniel Turner

Kelly A. Reed as Commissioner of the Monroe County Department of Human Services-Division of Social Services

Janice Waeghe

U.S. Bank as Custodian for PFS Financial 1, LLC a/k/a Propel Tax

People of the State of New York c/o The City Court of Rochester

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20, the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to petitioner, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the prem

NCS Home Properties

Robert Allen

People of the State of New York o/b/o Monroe County Office of Probation-Community Corrections

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Tower DBW II Trust 2013-1 a/k/a Tower Capital

People of the State of New York o/b/o New York State Department of Corrections c/o Rochester Correctional Facility

People of the State of New York c/o Monroe County Clerk

HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA)

County of Monroe

Scott Reynolds

American Tax Funding, LLC Wells Fargo Foothill as Secured Party

Luis R. Rodriguez

Michael Waeghe

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

TEATOR, MARY EILEEN

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY LAW DEPARTMENT

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Notices of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Notices of Appearance; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Computation

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Order of Reference and Affirmation in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Order of Reference and Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O MONROE COUNTY OFFICE OF PROBATION- COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O MONROE COUNTY OFFICE OF PROBATION- COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANICE WAEGHE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANICE WAEGHE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT ALLEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT ALLEN; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUIS R. RODRIGUEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUIS R. RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Notices of Appearance; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Order of Reference and Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Legal Description; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O MONROE COUNTY OFFICE OF PROBATION- COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANICE WAEGHE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT ALLEN; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LUIS R. RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less