Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 20:42:59 (UTC).

EB 2EMINY, LLC - v. - JOHNNY R. JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 EB 2EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOHNNY R JOHNSON. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1805

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Defendants

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O THE GATES TOWN COURT

NEW YORK STATE AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

CEDAR COMMONS APARTMENTS, LLC

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O THE CITY COURT OF ROCHESTER

UNIVERSITY OF ROCHESTER STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DIVISION

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT

MEDAILLE COLLEGE

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

FIRST NIAGARA BANK, N.A.

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, ESL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS C/O ROCHESTER CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O MONROE COUNTY CLERK

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II, LLC,

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O MONROE COUNTY OFFICE OF PROBATION-COMMUINITY CORRECTIONS

COUNTY OF MONROE

RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES, LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WALLS, MICHELE M

Attorney at NYS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

NEWMAN, JEREMY DAVID

CRAIN, MICHELE R.

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY Law Department

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

Other Attorneys

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe #1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Johnny Johnson (md)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Johnny Johnson (md); Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Department of T & F Civil Enforcement

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Department of T & F Civil Enforcement; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Cedar Commons Apartments

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Cedar Commons Apartments; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB Performance Recoveries

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB Performance Recoveries; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Affordable Housing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Affordable Housing; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Key Bank F/K/A First Niagara Bank

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Key Bank F/K/A First Niagara Bank; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Newman, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe #1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Johnny Johnson (md); Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unity Hospital s/h/a University of Roch. Strong Mem. Hos.; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Department of T & F Civil Enforcement; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Cedar Commons Apartments; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB Performance Recoveries; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New York State Affordable Housing; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Key Bank F/K/A First Niagara Bank; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less