Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 05:07:19 (UTC).

EB 2EMINY, LLC - v. - GEORGE ELLIS et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 EB 2EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GEORGE ELLIS. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1756

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 2EMINY, LLC

Defendants

COUNTY OF MONROE

Deborah Ellis

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC a/k/a PROPEL TAX

TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 a/k/a TOWER CAPITAL

George Ellis

AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

Horace Ellis

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Deborah Dixon

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT

PROPEL FINANCIAL I, LLC

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE CCED-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION

Not Yet Classified

George J Desmarteau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DESMARTEAU, GEORGE JOSEPH

Attorney at GEORGE DESMARTEAU, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Desmarteau, G.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #2) 3215 mailings

EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #2) 3215 mailings; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #2) aff of service

EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #2) aff of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) roc Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) roc Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #2) order of reference / atty aff

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #2) order of reference / atty aff; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE CCED-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE CCED-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL I , LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL I , LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Desmarteau, G.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #2) 3215 mailings; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #2) aff of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) roc Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #2) order of reference / atty aff; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) schedule A; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Deborah Ellis s/h/a John Doe#1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE CCED-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL I , LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less