Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 10:06:19 (UTC).

EB 1EMINY, LLC - v. - LUIS RIVERA A/K/A LUIS A. RIVERA et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 EB 1EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LUIS RIVERA A/K/A LUIS A RIVERA. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1941

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 1EMINY, LLC

Defendants

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK O/B/O MONROE COUNTY OFFICE OF PROBATION-COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS

Alma G. Lopez

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WESTERN DISTRICT)

LUIS RIVERA A/K/A LUIS A. RIVERA

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CIVIL ENFORCEMENT

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

LR CREDIT 16 LLC

DISCOVER BANK

TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SECTION

Tien Tran

CLEAR CHOICE HEARING AND BALANCE

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

COUNTY OF MONROE

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK ON BEHALF OF THE MONROE COUNTY CLERK

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK ON BEHALF OF THE CITY COURT OF ROCHESTER

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FLEMING, MARY ENRIGHT

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FEDERAL CENTRE

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

ALOI, PAUL MICHAEL

Attorney at PAUL M ALOI ESQ

CRAIN, MICHELE R.

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY Law Department

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

COURT NOTICE (Motion #1)

COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Notice of appearances

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Notice of appearances; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavits of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIEN TRAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIEN TRAN; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jesus Rivera js #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jesus Rivera js #2; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Antonio Rivera jd#1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Antonio Rivera jd#1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Alma Lopez md

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Alma Lopez md; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Luis Rivera md

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Luis Rivera md; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Notice of appearances; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Summons and complaint Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE -CIVIL ENFORCEMENT; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIEN TRAN; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jesus Rivera js #2; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Antonio Rivera jd#1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Alma Lopez md; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Luis Rivera md; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less