Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 07:29:23 (UTC).

EB 1EMINY, LLC - v. - LORIS SESSION et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 EB 1EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LORIS SESSION. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1754

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 1EMINY, LLC

Defendants

HOMESTEAD FUNDING CORP.

COUNTY OF MONROE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

TOWER DBW II TRUST 2013-1 A/K/A TOWER CAPITAL

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

CONTIMORTGAGE CORPORATION

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITIONS LLC

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

UNITED COMPANIES LENDING CORPORATION

Loris Session

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

BRENNER LEVY MUSIKER & WEINER LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITIONS LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITIONS LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMESTEAD FUNDING CORP.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMESTEAD FUNDING CORP.; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRENNER LEVY MUSIKER & WEINER LLP

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRENNER LEVY MUSIKER & WEINER LLP; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITIONS LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMESTEAD FUNDING CORP.; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRENNER LEVY MUSIKER & WEINER LLP; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less