Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 07:36:41 (UTC).

EB 1EMINY, LLC - v. - LATONYA SALEDRA MACK AS ADMINISTRATRIX AND POSSIBLE HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIS J. MCFADDEN et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 EB 1EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LATONYA SALEDRA MACK AS ADMINISTRATRIX AND POSSIBLE HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIS J MCFADDEN. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1752

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 1EMINY, LLC

Defendants

LATONYA SALEDRA MACK AS ADMINISTRATRIX AND POSSIBLE HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIS J. MCFADDEN

CITY OF ROCHESTER

U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

AMERICAN TAX FUNDING, LLC

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20 the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

COUNTY OF MONROE

ARDIS E. ISRAEL AS POSSIBLE HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIS J. MCFADDEN

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

LASHONA MACK AS POSSIBLE HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIS J. MCFADDEN

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WESTERN DISTRICT)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

CRAIN, MICHELE R.

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY Law Department

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF ROCHESTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF ROCHESTER; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavits of service; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Referee's oath and computation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Order of reference and affirmation; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COUNTY OF MONROE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF ROCHESTER; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE U.S. BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC A/K/A PROPEL TAX; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less