Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 08:57:04 (UTC).

EB 1EMINY, LLC - v. - James Wynn Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 EB 1EMINY, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against James Wynn Jr. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1790

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EB 1EMINY, LLC

Defendants

County of Monroe

U.S. Bank as Custodian for PFS Financial 1, LLC a/k/a Propel Tax

Tower DBW II Trust 2013-1 a/k/a Tower Capital

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20, the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premi

Propel Financial 1, LLC

James Wynn SR.

James Wynn JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

GOODWIN, BRIAN R.

Attorney at Goodwin Law Firm

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3) Consents to Discontinue

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3) Consents to Discontinue; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Discontinue

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Discontinue; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/29/2018

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order for SJ, Amend Caption, Appt. Referee, etc. signed 8/15/18

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order for SJ, Amend Caption, Appt. Referee, etc. signed 8/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASSANDRA BROWN S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASSANDRA BROWN S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAMES WYNN, JR. (MD)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAMES WYNN, JR. (MD); Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand Pursuant to Article IX Part E Section 9-108 fo the Charter of The Ci ... show more

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand Pursuant to Article IX Part E Section 9-108 fo the Charter of The Ci ... show more; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE James Wynn Sr

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE James Wynn Sr; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3) Consents to Discontinue; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Discontinue; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order for SJ, Amend Caption, Appt. Referee, etc. signed 8/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CASSANDRA BROWN S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAMES WYNN, JR. (MD); Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand Pursuant to Article IX Part E Section 9-108 fo the Charter of The City of Rochester; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE James Wynn Sr; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less