This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 13:30:55 (UTC).

EAC NETWORK, INC. v. ANTHONY GRANDE

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 EAC NETWORK, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANTHONY GRANDE. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAC NETWORK, INC.

Defendant

Anthony Grande

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERN, KENNETH MICHAEL

Attorney at GENSER DUBOW GENSER & CONA

Defendant Attorney

GLEIS, CHARLES JEFFERY

Attorney at CHARLES GLEIS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A- Commission to Guardian

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A- Commission to Guardian; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY GRANDE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY GRANDE; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A- Commission to Guardian; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gleis, C.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY GRANDE; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less