This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:59:34 (UTC).

DYKELL FARMER et al - v. - CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 DYKELL FARMER filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dykell Farmer an Infant by His Mother and Natural Guardian, SHAKIRRA COSTA

Shakirra Costa Individually

Defendants

CITY OF NEW YORK

UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.

UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

MICHAEL R. DOLCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, CARY HUNTER

Attorney at Law Offices of Kaplan & Kaplan

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

KELLY, WILLIAM G

Attorney at Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT Supplemental Parent's Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Supplemental Parent's Affidavit; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT Infant's Consent

AFFIDAVIT Infant's Consent; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - UR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - UR; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Hospital and Medical Records

EXHIBIT(S) - D Hospital and Medical Records; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCDOT

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCDOT; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kelly, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Revised

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Revised; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kelly, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - CNY

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - CNY; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Proof of Out-of-Pocket Disbursements

EXHIBIT(S) - C Proof of Out-of-Pocket Disbursements; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED)

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Revised; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Infant's Consent; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Supplemental Parent's Affidavit; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Hospital and Medical Records; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Proof of Out-of-Pocket Disbursements; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Offer Letter; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kelly, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kelly, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - UR; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCDOT; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE Proof of Service - CNY; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Kaplan, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less