This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/23/2023 at 09:05:24 (UTC).

Dustin A Parker v. Miss Laura's Diner et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Dustin A Parker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Miss Laura's Diner. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0804

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dustin A Parker

Defendants

Miss Laura's Diner

Laura Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOSCIALPO, MICHAEL JOHN

Defendant Attorney

LEADER, HENRY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 04/27/2022; Received: 04/27/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/19/2022; Received: 05/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A social media posts

EXHIBIT(S) - A social media posts; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/19/2022; Received: 05/19/2022

ANSWER Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim

ANSWER Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

INTERROGATORIES

INTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketINTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/31/2022; Received: 05/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A social media posts; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/19/2022; Received: 05/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/19/2022; Received: 05/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leader, H.; Filed: 04/27/2022; Received: 04/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Loscialpo, M.; Filed: 03/30/2022; Received: 03/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less